Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zenobio Maria Benucci, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Tibet-Hindustan

Titular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1779BornFirenze, Italy
21 Nov 180122.2Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1803²23.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Aug 182041.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tibet-Hindustan, India
29 Aug 182041.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
30 Jun 182242.8Ordained BishopVicar Apostolic of Tibet-Hindustan, India
23 Jun 182444.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Tibet-Hindustan, India

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Zenobio Maria Benucci
Bishop Zenobio Maria Benucci O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Tibet-Hindustan

  • a priest for 21.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Catholic Encyclopedia
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 366
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1822, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 May 2016