Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Damasceno Da Silva Póvoas

Deceased

Bishop of Angola e Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1780BornPorto
13 Nov 180323.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Nov 180323.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 181433.7SelectedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
19 Dec 181434.1ConfirmedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
6 Oct 181635.9Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
21 Feb 182645.3DiedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola

MicroData Summary for João Damasceno Da Silva Póvoas:
Bishop João Damasceno Da Silva Póvoas (born , died ) Bishop of Angola e Congo

  • a priest for 22.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013