Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartholomeu de Martyribus Maya, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Prelate of Mozambico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1764BornSandomil, Brazil
16 Feb 178823.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
12 Jul 181449.9SelectedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
8 Mar 181651.6ConfirmedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
28 Oct 181652.2Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
10 Nov 181955.3AppointedPrelate of Mozambico, Mozambique
1828¹63.4DiedPrelate of Mozambico, Mozambique

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartholomeu de Martyribus Maya:
Bishop Bartholomeu de Martyribus Maya O.C.D. (born ) Prelate of Mozambico

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013