Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cecil DeSa

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Agra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1922BornKharagpur
29 Sep 194825.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jun 197148.5AppointedBishop of Lucknow, India
16 Oct 197148.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lucknow, India
11 Nov 198361.0AppointedArchbishop of Agra, India
16 Apr 199875.4RetiredArchbishop of Agra, India
27 Oct 200683.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Agra, India

MicroData Summary for Cecil DeSa:
Archbishop Cecil DeSa (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Agra

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Jul 2014