Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidore Fernandes

Bishop Emeritus of Allahabad, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1947 Born
28 Oct 197225.8Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 198841.3AppointedBishop of Allahabad, India
4 Aug 198841.5Ordained BishopBishop of Allahabad, India
31 Jan 201366.0ResignedBishop of Allahabad, India

MicroData Summary for Isidore Fernandes
Bishop Isidore Fernandes (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Allahabad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalathur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Allahabad.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,010
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast