Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Paul D’Souza

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Varanasi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1928BornBendur
20 Dec 195325.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jun 197042.1AppointedBishop of Banaras, India
8 Aug 197042.2Ordained BishopBishop of Banaras, India
24 Feb 200778.8RetiredBishop of Varanasi, India
16 Oct 201486.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Varanasi, India

MicroData Summary for Patrick Paul D’Souza:
Bishop Patrick Paul D’Souza (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Varanasi

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Feb 2007
  • d: CB, 16 Oct 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015