Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic Kokkat, C.S.T.

Bishop Emeritus of Gorakhpur (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1932 BornVaikom
4 Oct 196028.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Saint Theresa of the Child Jesus “Little Flower”
19 Jun 198452.3AppointedBishop of Gorakhpur (Syro-Malabarese), India
4 Oct 198452.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gorakhpur (Syro-Malabarese), India
15 Jul 200674.4RetiredBishop of Gorakhpur (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Dominic Kokkat:
Bishop Dominic Kokkat C.S.T. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Gorakhpur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gorakhpur (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013