Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Varanasi

Dioecesis Varanasiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 14 May 1971
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Agra
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 21,418 (8,272 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, 45 Varanasi Cantt. 221002, U.P., India
  • Telephone: (0542)250.27.61; 250.42.35
  • Fax: 250.27.67

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Gorakhpur
11 July 1946ErectedDiocese of Allahabad Prefecture Apostolic of Gorakhpur (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Benares-Gorakhpur
17 September 1958Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Gorakhpur Prefecture Apostolic of Benares-Gorakhpur
Diocese of Banaras
5 June 1970ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Benares-Gorakhpur Diocese of Banaras
Diocese of Varanasi
14 May 1971Name ChangedDiocese of Banaras Diocese of Varanasi
19 June 1984Territory LostDiocese of Varanasi Diocese of Gorakhpur (Syro-Malabarese) (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Gorakhpur
19504,45112,100,000.0%7162319324309ap1951
Prefecture Apostolic of Benares-Gorakhpur
Diocese of Banaras
19708,78319,000,000.0%3023531653984ap1971
Diocese of Varanasi
198010,86222,888,800.0%30336317275284ap1981
199011,96213,914,932.1%50348414210134132ap1991
199914,42717,353,775.1%66431091328439934ap2000
200014,30417,353,775.1%62461081328438835ap2001
200114,97817,353,775.1%65411061419238235ap2002
200215,10118,628,614.1%695312212311042936ap2003
200315,65921,626,916.1%695512412612545136ap2004
200416,16918,650,517.1%735112413014746436ap2005
201018,25920,328,000.1%1015015112011645743ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.1, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 16 Oct 2014