Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Innocent Fernandes

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Delhi, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1913Born
29 Aug 193724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bombay, India
4 Jun 195945.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Delhi, India
4 Jun 195945.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Novae Patrae
1 Nov 195946.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Novae Patrae
16 Sep 196754.1SucceededArchbishop of Delhi, India
19 Nov 199077.3RetiredArchbishop of Delhi, India
30 Jan 200086.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Delhi, India

MicroData Summary for Angelo Innocent Fernandes
Archbishop Angelo Innocent Fernandes (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Delhi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarachi

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 99
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast