Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal Margéot

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Port-Louis

Cardinal-Priest of San Gabriele Arcangelo all’Acqua Traversa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1916BornQuatre-Bornes
17 Dec 193822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Port-Louis, Mauritius
6 Feb 196953.0AppointedBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
4 May 196953.3Ordained BishopBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
28 Jun 198872.4Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 198872.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Gabriele Arcangelo all’Acqua Traversa
15 Feb 199377.0RetiredBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
17 Jul 200993.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Port-Louis, Mauritius

MicroData Summary for Jean Margéot:
Cardinal Jean Margéot (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Port-Louis

  • a priest for 70.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
  • a cardinal for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013