Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilbert Guillaume Marie-Jean Aubry

Bishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1942 Born
23 Aug 197028.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
20 Nov 197533.5AppointedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
2 May 197633.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion

MicroData Summary for Gilbert Guillaume Marie-Jean Aubry
Bishop Gilbert Guillaume Marie-Jean Aubry (born ) Bishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Louis
Ordained BishopLe stade de La Redoute, Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion, Diocese of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 35, Number 2,151

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 10 Sep 2020

Quantcast