Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcel-François Lefebvre, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tulle, France

Note/Previous Titular See: (left the Church)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1905Born
21 Sep 192923.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lille, France
193125.0ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
12 Jun 194741.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dakar, Senegal
12 Jun 194741.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Anthedon
18 Sep 194741.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anthedon
9 Jan 194842.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Saint-Louis du Sénégal
22 Sep 194842.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Arcadiopolis in Europa
22 Sep 194842.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Dakar
28 Jan 195549.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Saint-Louis du Sénégal
14 Sep 195549.7AppointedArchbishop of Dakar, Senegal
9 Jul 195953.6ResignedApostolic Delegate to Dakar
23 Jan 196256.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Tulle, France
27 Jul 196256.6AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
7 Aug 196256.6ResignedBishop of Tulle, France
7 Aug 196256.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Synnada in Phrygia
29 Oct 196862.9ResignedSuperior General of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
10 Dec 197065.0ResignedTitular Archbishop of Synnada in Phrygia
25 Mar 199185.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Tulle, France

MicroData Summary for Marcel-François Lefebvre (VIAF: 93457884)
Archbishop Marcel-François Lefebvre C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tulle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTourcoing, Diocese of Lille
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Church, Tourcoing, Diocese of Lille
Death PlaceMartigny, Diocese of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
Buried Place (Original)SSPX, Seminary, Écône, Diocese of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
Buried Place (Current)Cœur Immaculé de Marie, Church, Écône, Diocese of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1947, Number 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 27 Sep 2020

Quantcast