Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Ndong

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oyem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1906BornNzamalige
17 Apr 193832.2Ordained PriestPriest of Libreville, Gabon
15 Nov 196054.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Libreville, Gabon
15 Nov 196054.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Raphanea
2 Jul 196155.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Raphanea
29 May 196963.4AppointedBishop of Oyem, Gabon
23 Aug 198276.6RetiredBishop of Oyem, Gabon
18 Nov 198983.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Oyem, Gabon

MicroData Summary for François Ndong:
Bishop François Ndong (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oyem

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015