Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Pointe-Noire

Archidioecesis Nigrirostrensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Abel Liluala, Archbishop-Elect
  • Miguel Ángel Olaverri Arroniz, S.D.B., Archbishop Emeritus
  • Jean-Claude Makaya Loembe, Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 30 May 2020
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo
  • Square Kilometers: 14,644 (5,656 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocese-pointe-noire-congo.org/
  • Mailing Address: 82 rue Avenue Moe Vangoula, Pointe-Noire, Rep. du Congo
  • Telephone: 05.559.30.70

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Lower French Congo {Congo Francese Inferiore}
14 October 1890SplitVicariate Apostolic of French Congo {Congo Francese} Vicariate Apostolic of Upper French Congo {Congo Francese Superiore} o Ubanghi
Vicariate Apostolic of Lower French Congo {Congo Francese Inferiore}
Vicariate Apostolic of Loango
22 April 1907Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Lower French Congo {Congo Francese Inferiore} Vicariate Apostolic of Loango
2 August 1929Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Brazzaville (Boundaries adjusted)
Vicariate Apostolic of Loango (Boundaries adjusted)
Vicariate Apostolic of Pointe-Noire
20 January 1949Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Loango Vicariate Apostolic of Pointe-Noire
Diocese of Pointe-Noire
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Pointe-Noire Diocese of Pointe-Noire
28 November 1958Territory LostDiocese of Pointe-Noire (Mayoumba et Tchibanga) Diocese of Libreville
28 November 1958Territory AddedDiocese of Libreville (Zanaga) Diocese of Pointe-Noire
5 December 1983Territory LostDiocese of Pointe-Noire (Niari, Lekoumou, and Bouenza) Diocese of Nkayi (erected)
Archdiocese of Pointe-Noire
30 May 2020ElevatedDiocese of Pointe-Noire Archdiocese of Pointe-Noire

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Pointe-Noire
19503,59870,2745.1%83442854014ap1951
Diocese of Pointe-Noire
1970150,923456,40733.1%856642,3587250ap1971
1978200,000590,00033.9%723306,666264520ap1981
1990190,000400,00047.5%7111810,555132113ap1991
1997373,658700,00053.4%3311448,492302434ap2000
2000389,000728,00053.4%2416409,725242755ap2001
2001641,0001,200,00053.4%39115012,820143845ap2002
2002400,000800,00050.0%3813517,843154543ap2003
2003900,0001,800,00050.0%30124221,428134034ap2004
20041,000,0002,000,00050.0%31124323,255164535ap2005
20131,500,0002,535,00059.2%64127619,736324230ap2014
2016887,0001,500,00059.1%63208310,686524833ap2017
2019958,9001,622,40059.1%59298810,896295935ap2020
Archdiocese of Pointe-Noire
20211,007,4401,704,53059.1%71239410,717277036ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Loango
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 22, Page 266
  • Vicariate Apostolic of Pointe-Noire
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 41, Page 148
  • Diocese of Pointe-Noire
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 48, Page 113, to Page 119
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 51, Page 41
  • Archdiocese of Pointe-Noire
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 112, Page 612, and Page 613

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Feb 2024