Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miguel 聲gel Olaverri Arroniz, S.D.B.

Archbishop of Pointe-Noire, Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1948 Born
5 May 197627.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
31 Mar 201162.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Pointe-Noire, Congo
22 Feb 201364.7AppointedBishop of Pointe-Noire, Congo
28 Apr 201364.9Ordained BishopBishop of Pointe-Noire, Congo
30 May 202072.0AppointedArchbishop of Pointe-Noire, Congo

MicroData Summary for Miguel 聲gel Olaverri Arroniz
Archbishop Miguel 聲gel Olaverri Arroniz S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop of Pointe-Noire

EventPlace
Birth PlacePamplona, Spain
Ordained BishopStade municipal, Pointe-Noire, Diocese of Pointe-Noire

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Pointe-Noire.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2013
  • ob: CB, 26 Mar 2013
  • c2: CB, 29 Apr 2013
  • c34: CB, 30 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,778
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 30 May 2020

Quantcast