Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Romeo Pawłowski

Apostolic Nuncio to Greece

Titular Archbishop of Sejny


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1960 Born
1 Jun 198524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno, Poland
24 Feb 200443.2IncardinatedPriest of Bydgoszcz, Poland
18 Mar 200948.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sejny
18 Mar 200948.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Congo, Republic of
18 Mar 200948.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Gabon
30 Apr 200948.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sejny
7 Dec 201555.0AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
17 Dec 202060.0AppointedSecretary (Pontifical Representations) of the Secretariat of State
10 Sep 202261.7ResignedSecretary (Pontifical Representations) of the Secretariat of State
1 Dec 202262.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Greece

MicroData Summary for Jan Romeo Pawłowski
(VIAF: 6280150567626006370001; WikiData: Q1646233)
Archbishop Jan Romeo Pawłowski (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Greece

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiskupiec Reszelski, Poland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bydgoszcz, Diocese of Bydgoszcz, Poland

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Greece.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,164
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 6 Jan 2024