Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Charles Émile Gardin, C.S.Sp.

Bishop of Impfondo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1941 BornSaint-Pois, France
196927.2Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
29 Jun 196927.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
30 Oct 200059.0AppointedPrefect of Likouala, Congo
11 Feb 201169.3AppointedBishop of Impfondo, Congo
26 Mar 201169.4Ordained BishopBishop of Impfondo, Congo
10 Apr 201169.5InstalledBishop of Impfondo, Congo

MicroData Summary for Jean Charles Émile Gardin:
Bishop Jean Charles Émile Gardin C.S.Sp. (born ) Bishop of Impfondo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Impfondo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,979

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013