Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfio Rapisarda

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Portugal

Titular Archbishop of Cannae

Titular See: (Zaire)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1933 Born
14 Jul 195723.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Apr 197945.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cannae
22 Apr 197945.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bolivia
27 May 197945.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cannae
29 Jan 198551.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Congo, Democratic Republic of
2 Jun 199258.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil
12 Oct 200269.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
8 Nov 200875.1RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Portugal

MicroData Summary for Alfio Rapisarda
Archbishop Alfio Rapisarda (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Portugal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZafferana Etnea, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Portugal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Nov 2008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017