Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Lino da Silva Dinis

Deceased

Bishop of Itumbiara, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1943Born
15 Aug 196623.4Ordained PriestPriest
24 Feb 199956.0AppointedBishop of Itumbiara, Goias, Brazil
1 May 199956.1Ordained BishopBishop of Itumbiara, Goias, Brazil
1 Dec 201370.7DiedBishop of Itumbiara, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Lino da Silva Dinis
Bishop Antônio Lino da Silva Dinis (born , died ) Bishop of Itumbiara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVila Nova de Famalicão

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,506
  • d: CB, 1 Dec 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018