Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carillo Gritti, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Prelate of Itacoatiara, Amazonas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1942BornMartinengo
24 Jun 196725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
5 Jan 200057.6AppointedPrelate of Itacoatiara, Amazonas, Brazil
19 Mar 200057.8Ordained BishopPrelate of Itacoatiara, Amazonas, Brazil
9 Jun 201674.0DiedPrelate of Itacoatiara, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Carillo Gritti
Bishop Carillo Gritti I.M.C. (born , died ) Prelate of Itacoatiara

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,717
  • d: CB, 9 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 10 Jun 2016