Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Libório Camino Saracho

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Presidente Prudente, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1931Born
6 Jul 195826.6Ordained PriestPriest of São Miguel Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
16 Jun 199967.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Miguel Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
16 Jun 199967.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Urusi
29 Sep 199967.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Urusi
20 Feb 200270.2AppointedBishop of Presidente Prudente, Sao Paulo, Brazil
16 Apr 200876.4RetiredBishop of Presidente Prudente, Sao Paulo, Brazil
30 Aug 202189.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Presidente Prudente, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José María Libório Camino Saracho
Bishop José María Libório Camino Saracho (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Presidente Prudente

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanturce, Spain
Ordained BishopSão Miguel Arcanjo, Cathedral, São Miguel Paulista, Diocese of São Miguel Paulista, Sao Paulo
Death PlaceSanta Maggiore, Hospital, São Paolo, Archdiocese of São Paulo

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,633
  • d: CB, 30 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Aug 2021

Quantcast