Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Urbain Ngassongo

Bishop of Gamboma, Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1961 Born
20 Jul 199634.7Ordained PriestPriest of Brazzaville, Congo
22 Feb 201351.3AppointedBishop of Gamboma, Congo
21 Apr 201351.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gamboma, Congo

MicroData Summary for Urbain Ngassongo
Bishop Urbain Ngassongo (born ) Bishop of Gamboma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKinshasa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gamboma.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2013
  • ob: CB, 26 Mar 2013
  • c2+: CB, 22 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,769

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018