Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Brazzaville

Archidioecesis Brazzapolitana



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo
  • Square Kilometers: 14,450 (5,581 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: https://www.archidiocesedebrazzaville.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, B.P. 2301, Av. Cardinal Emile Biayenda 1, Brazzaville, Rep. du Congo
  • Telephone: 06.968.39.08; 05.660.69.07

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of French Congo {Congo Francese}
4 June 1886ErectedVicariate Apostolic of French Congo {Congo Francese} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Upper French Congo {Congo Francese Superiore} o Ubanghi
14 October 1890SplitVicariate Apostolic of French Congo {Congo Francese} Vicariate Apostolic of Upper French Congo {Congo Francese Superiore} o Ubanghi
Vicariate Apostolic of Lower French Congo {Congo Francese Inferiore}
8 May 1909Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Upper French Congo {Congo Francese Superiore} o Ubanghi Prefecture Apostolic of Oubangui Chari (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Brazzaville
14 June 1922Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Upper French Congo {Congo Francese Superiore} o Ubanghi Vicariate Apostolic of Brazzaville
8 February 1929Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Brazzaville (Haute Sangha) Prefecture Apostolic of Oubangui Chari
2 August 1929Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Brazzaville (Boundaries adjusted)
Vicariate Apostolic of Loango (Boundaries adjusted)
28 May 1940Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Oubangui Chari (Southern part) Vicariate Apostolic of Brazzaville
21 December 1950Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Brazzaville (Alima, Sanga-Likouala, and Likouala) Vicariate Apostolic of Fort-Rousset (erected)
Archdiocese of Brazzaville
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Brazzaville Archdiocese of Brazzaville
3 October 1987Territory LostArchdiocese of Brazzaville (Boko, Mindouli, Kindamba, Mayama, and part of Kinkala) Diocese of Kinkala (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Brazzaville
1950107,888400,00027.0%751581,860734716ap1951
Archdiocese of Brazzaville
1959106,267245,00043.4%1554691,540748517ap1960
1964160,756360,00044.7%2651772,087679824ap1971
1980370,000610,00060.7%2050705,2852267731ap1981
1990322,912840,53538.4%2538635,12510813235ap1991
1997588,1381,388,13842.4%62401025,766847430ap2000
2000587,0651,387,06542.3%5428827,159727432ap2001
2001587,0651,387,06542.3%5728856,906797432ap2002
2002587,0651,500,00039.1%6529946,245848834ap2003
2003587,0651,500,00039.1%5629856,906848835ap2004
2004418,647719,95058.1%5134854,9251058835ap2005
2006431,225758,00056.9%63411044,14610524040ap2007
2012505,000886,00057.0%98481463,45818430445ap2013
2015544,000955,00057.0%107601673,25718228247ap2016
2018587,3851,031,62056.9%103631663,53816229747ap2019
2020712,5511,373,38251.9%120721923,71116624553ap2021
2022747,6501,440,09051.9%138772153,47718727453ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Brazzaville
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 22, Page 266
  • Archdiocese of Brazzaville
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 48, Page 113, to Page 119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 19 Feb 2024