Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Émile Cardinal Biayenda

Deceased

Archbishop of Brazzaville, Congo

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco in Agro Laurentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1927²Born
26 Oct 195831.8Ordained PriestPriest of Brazzaville, Congo
7 Mar 197043.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Brazzaville, Congo
7 Mar 197043.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Garba
17 May 197043.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Garba
14 Jun 197144.4SucceededArchbishop of Brazzaville, Congo
5 Mar 197346.1Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 197346.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco in Agro Laurentino
22 Mar 197750.2DiedArchbishop of Brazzaville, Congo

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Émile Biayenda (VIAF: 64161880)
Émile Cardinal Biayenda (born 1927, died ) Archbishop of Brazzaville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMfinkabitoungou
Ordained PriestSacré Cœur, Cathedral, Brazzaville, Archdiocese of Brazzaville
Ordained BishopUrbain College, de Propaganda Fide, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceBrazzaville, Archdiocese of Brazzaville
Buried Place (Original)Sacré Cœur, Cathedral, Brazzaville, Archdiocese of Brazzaville

  • a priest for 18.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
  • a cardinal for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 469

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast