Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cyriaque Siméon Obamba

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mouila, Gabon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1918Born
12 May 194628.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Oct 197658.6AppointedBishop of Mouila, Gabon
30 Jan 197758.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mouila, Gabon
22 Apr 199274.1RetiredBishop of Mouila, Gabon
7 Jul 199678.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Mouila, Gabon

MicroData Summary for Cyriaque Siméon Obamba
Bishop Cyriaque Siméon Obamba (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mouila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOghéwa

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast