Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Libreville

Archidioecesis Liberopolitana



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jean-Patrick Iba-Ba, Archbishop
  • Basile Mvé Engone, S.D.B., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone}
22 January 1842ErectedDiocese of Funchal
Diocese of São Tomé e Príncipe
Prefecture Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone}
1846ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone} Vicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone}
10 October 1855Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone} Vicariate Apostolic of Annobon, Corisco and Fernando Poo Islands (erected)
13 April 1858Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone} Vicariate Apostolic of Sierra Leone (erected)
28 August 1860Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone} Vicariate Apostolic of Dahomey (erected)
6 February 1863SplitVicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone} Vicariate Apostolic of Senegambia
Vicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées}
Vicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées}
6 February 1863SplitVicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone} Vicariate Apostolic of Senegambia
Vicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées}
3 July 1879Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées} Prefecture Apostolic of Cimbebasia (erected)
27 September 1879Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées} Prefecture Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast} (erected)
2 May 1884Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées} Prefecture Apostolic of Upper Niger {Niger Superiore} (erected)
22 November 1886Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées} Mission "Sui Iuris" of Belgian Congo {Congo Belga} o Indipendente (erected)
18 March 1890Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées} Prefecture Apostolic of Cameroun (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Gabon
18 March 1890Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées} Vicariate Apostolic of Gabon
Vicariate Apostolic of Libreville
10 July 1947Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Gabon Vicariate Apostolic of Libreville
13 December 1951Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Libreville (Souanké) Vicariate Apostolic of Fort-Rousset
Diocese of Libreville
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Libreville Diocese of Libreville
28 November 1958Territory AddedDiocese of Pointe-Noire (Mayoumba et Tchibanga) Diocese of Libreville
28 November 1958Territory LostDiocese of Libreville (Zanaga) Diocese of Pointe-Noire
11 December 1958Territory LostDiocese of Libreville (Haut-Ogoouè, Ogoouè-Lolo, Ngouniè, and Ngouniè-Nyanga) Diocese of Mouila (erected)
Archdiocese of Libreville
11 December 1958ElevatedDiocese of Libreville Archdiocese of Libreville
29 May 1969Territory LostArchdiocese of Libreville (Oyem and Makoku) Diocese of Oyem (erected)
19 March 2003Territory LostArchdiocese of Libreville (Ogooué-Maritime) Diocese of Port-Gentil (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Libreville
1950120,000350,00034.3%1733502,400376523ap1951
Diocese of Libreville
Archdiocese of Libreville
19703,640210,0001.7%22244679607416ap1971
1980188,000305,00061.6%1433474,000588022ap1981
1990360,000600,00060.0%1126379,729789027ap1991
1999416,000696,00059.8%1545606,93316610733ap2000
2000423,000708,00059.7%1639557,69013711829ap2001
2001380,000600,00063.3%1641576,666110711329ap2002
2002420,000780,00053.8%1431459,333211912439ap2003
2003352,000660,00053.3%1434487,33315810424ap2004
2004289,500553,77752.3%1924436,7321488523ap2005
2013483,000807,00059.9%4644905,36629110435ap2014
2016534,000894,00059.7%3748856,28227810836ap2017
2019565,000955,00059.2%3649856,64719010838ap2020
2021576,830975,00059.2%4454985,88629312637ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone}
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 475
  • Diocese of Libreville
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 48, Page 113, to Page 119
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 51, Page 41
  • Archdiocese of Libreville
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 51, Page 452, and Page 453
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
    Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 7 Aug 2023