Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Benoît Truffet, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées}

Titular Bishop of Callipolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1812BornRumilly-en-Albanais, France
19 Jul 183522.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
17 Nov 184634.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées}, Gabon
11 Dec 184634.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Callipolis
25 Jan 184734.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callipolis
23 Nov 184735.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées}, Gabon

MicroData Summary for Jean-Benoît Truffet:
Bishop Jean-Benoît Truffet C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées}

  • a priest for 12.3 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013