Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloys Kobès, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Senegambia

Titular Bishop of Methone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1820BornFessenheim, France
21 Dec 184424.6Ordained PriestPriest
1847¹26.7ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
22 Sep 184828.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone}, Gabon
22 Sep 184828.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Methone
30 Nov 184828.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Methone
6 Feb 186342.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal
11 Oct 187252.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aloys Kobès (VIAF: 272137757)
Bishop Aloys Kobès C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Senegambia

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 382
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Dec 2016