Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Jean Martrou, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Gabon

Titular Bishop of Corycus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1876BornRiom-ès-Montagnes, France
27 Aug 189922.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
10 Dec 191236.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Gabon, Gabon
10 Dec 191236.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Corycus
24 Feb 191336.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corycus
7 May 191437.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Gabon, Gabon
22 Mar 192548.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Gabon, Gabon

MicroData Summary for Louis Jean Martrou:
Bishop Louis Jean Martrou C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Gabon

  • a priest for 25.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013