Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Nicolas-Xavier-Louis Besson

Deceased

Bishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1821Born
7 Sep 184523.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Aug 187553.8SelectedBishop of Nîmes, France
23 Sep 187553.9ConfirmedBishop of Nîmes, France
14 Nov 187554.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nîmes, France
18 Nov 188867.1DiedBishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France

MicroData Summary for François-Nicolas-Xavier-Louis Besson (VIAF: 73892385)
Bishop François-Nicolas-Xavier-Louis Besson (born , died ) Bishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaume-les-Dames
Ordained BishopCathedral, Besançon, Archdiocese of Besançon

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 405
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Mar 2017