Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Jacques-Marie-Antoine Guerrin

Deceased

Bishop of Langres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1793BornVesoul
16 May 181824.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Oct 185157.8SelectedBishop of Langres, France
15 Mar 185258.2ConfirmedBishop of Langres, France
23 May 185258.4Ordained BishopBishop of Langres, France
19 Mar 187783.2DiedBishop of Langres, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Jacques-Marie-Antoine Guerrin:
Bishop Jean-Jacques-Marie-Antoine Guerrin (born , died ) Bishop of Langres

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 345

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013