Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon-Charles-Joseph Girod, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Loango, Congo

Titular Bishop of Obba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1871Born
30 Nov 189625.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
13 Jan 191543.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Loango, Congo
13 Jan 191543.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Obba
6 Jun 191544.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obba
13 Dec 191948.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Loango, Congo

MicroData Summary for Léon-Charles-Joseph Girod
Bishop Léon-Charles-Joseph Girod C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Loango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBonnefontaine, France

  • a priest for 23.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018