Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Augustin Le Coeur

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Flour


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1848BornRouen
21 Jul 187224.4Ordained PriestPriest of Rouen, France
13 Jul 190658.3AppointedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
8 Aug 190658.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
24 Aug 190658.4InstalledBishop of Saint-Flour, France
18 Mar 194294.0DiedBishop of Saint-Flour, France

MicroData Summary for Paul-Augustin Le Coeur:
Bishop Paul-Augustin Le Coeur (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Flour

  • a priest for 69.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013