Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amédée-Marie-Alexis Maisonobe

Deceased

Bishop of Belley


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1882BornCrandelles
16 Apr 190623.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 193552.4AppointedBishop of Belley, France
6 Aug 193552.6Ordained BishopBishop of Belley, France
15 Nov 195471.9DiedBishop of Belley, France

MicroData Summary for Amédée-Marie-Alexis Maisonobe:
Bishop Amédée-Marie-Alexis Maisonobe (born , died ) Bishop of Belley

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013