Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges-Auguste Louis

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Périgueux (-Sarlat)

Titular Archbishop of Mimiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1882BornLivry-Gargan
29 Jun 190724.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Aug 193249.8AppointedBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
9 Nov 193250.0Ordained BishopBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
3 Aug 196582.8RetiredBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
3 Aug 196582.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mimiana
30 Dec 196785.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France

MicroData Summary for Georges-Auguste Louis:
Archbishop Georges-Auguste Louis (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Périgueux (-Sarlat)

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013