Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernand-Pierre-Robert Bézac des Martinies

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aire et Dax


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1904BornPérigueux
10 Jul 192925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
16 Jan 196156.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Aire et Dax, France
16 Jan 196156.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Metropolis in Asia
25 Apr 196157.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metropolis in Asia
25 Mar 196359.0SucceededBishop of Aire et Dax, France
25 Apr 197874.1RetiredBishop of Aire et Dax, France
28 Mar 198985.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Aire et Dax, France

MicroData Summary for Fernand-Pierre-Robert Bézac des Martinies:
Bishop Fernand-Pierre-Robert Bézac des Martinies (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aire et Dax

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015