Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume-Marius Sembel

Deceased

Bishop of Dijon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1883BornClermont-Ferrand
16 Nov 190724.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 193753.3AppointedBishop of Dijon, France
1 Jun 193753.5Ordained BishopBishop of Dijon, France
11 Apr 196480.4DiedBishop of Dijon, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume-Marius Sembel:
Bishop Guillaume-Marius Sembel (born , died ) Bishop of Dijon

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013