Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aimable Chassaigne

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tulle, France

Titular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1885Born
29 Jul 192035.3Ordained PriestPriest of Clermont, France
6 Feb 194054.8AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
25 Apr 194055.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
23 Jan 196276.7RetiredBishop of Tulle, France
23 Jan 196276.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Byzacena
6 Apr 196277.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Tulle, France

MicroData Summary for Aimable Chassaigne
Bishop Aimable Chassaigne (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tulle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThiers

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017