Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles-Marie-Paul Vignancour

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bourges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1908BornClermont-Ferrand
11 Apr 193627.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 195749.6AppointedBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France
19 Mar 195849.9Ordained BishopBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France
6 Mar 196657.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bourges, France
6 Mar 196657.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Neapolis in Proconsulari
10 Oct 196961.4SucceededArchbishop of Bourges, France
8 Apr 198475.9RetiredArchbishop of Bourges, France
8 Nov 198779.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Marie-Paul Vignancour:
Archbishop Charles-Marie-Paul Vignancour (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bourges

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013