Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Jean Marie Rozier

Deceased

Bishop of Poitiers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1924BornMurat-le-Quaire
28 Sep 194723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Clermont, France
10 May 197146.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Clermont, France
10 May 197146.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Maximiana in Numidia
26 Sep 197147.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maximiana in Numidia
11 Apr 197348.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Poitiers, France
5 Jul 197551.1SucceededBishop of Poitiers, France
12 Jun 199470.0DiedBishop of Poitiers, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph Jean Marie Rozier:
Bishop Joseph Jean Marie Rozier (born , died ) Bishop of Poitiers

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013