Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Marie Julien Cardinal Balland

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1934BornBué
3 Sep 196127.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bourges, France
6 Nov 198248.3AppointedBishop of Dijon, France
12 Dec 198248.4Ordained BishopBishop of Dijon, France
8 Aug 198854.0AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
27 May 199560.8AppointedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
21 Feb 199863.6Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 199863.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
1 Mar 199863.6DiedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France

MicroData Summary for Jean Marie Julien Balland:
Cardinal Jean Marie Julien Balland (born , died ) Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
  • a cardinal for .0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 9 Oct 2013