Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Albert Florent Augustin Cardinal Decourtray

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1923BornWattignies
29 Jun 194724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lille, France
27 May 197148.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dijon, France
27 May 197148.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
3 Jul 197148.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
22 Apr 197451.0AppointedBishop of Dijon, France
29 Oct 198158.6AppointedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
23 Apr 198259.0AppointedPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
25 May 198562.1Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 198562.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
1 Oct 198865.5ResignedPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
16 Sep 199471.4DiedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France

MicroData Summary for Albert Florent Augustin Decourtray:
Cardinal Albert Florent Augustin Decourtray (born , died ) Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
  • a cardinal for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 22 Nov 2013