Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Marie Louis Bonfils, S.M.A.

Bishop Emeritus of Nice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1930 BornMontpellier
7 Dec 195424.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
28 Nov 199262.8AppointedBishop of Viviers, France
10 Jan 199362.9Ordained BishopBishop of Viviers, France
28 Aug 199868.5AppointedBishop of Nice, France
28 Mar 200575.1RetiredBishop of Nice, France
23 Sep 201181.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ajaccio, France
22 Feb 201282.0ResignedApostolic Administrator of Ajaccio, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Marie Louis Bonfils:
Bishop Jean Marie Louis Bonfils S.M.A. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nice

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nice.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: CB, 23 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,995
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013