Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Olivier Jacques Marie de Germay de Cirfontaine

Archbishop of Lyon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1960 Born
17 May 199837.6Ordained PriestPriest of Toulouse (-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux), France
22 Feb 201251.4AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
14 Apr 201251.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
22 Oct 202060.0AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
20 Dec 202060.2InstalledArchbishop of Lyon, France

MicroData Summary for Olivier Jacques Marie de Germay de Cirfontaine
Archbishop Olivier Jacques Marie de Germay de Cirfontaine (born ) Archbishop of Lyon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTours, Archdiocese of Tours
Ordained BishopPlace Miot, Ajaccio, Diocese of Ajaccio

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lyon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2012
  • ob: CB, 22 Feb 2012
  • c2+: CB, 16 Mar 2012
  • name: CB, 17 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,420
  • i: CB, 22 Oct 2020
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast