Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert Jean Louis Le Gall, O.S.B.

Archbishop of Toulouse (-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1946 BornSaint-Hilaire-du-Harcouët
8 Dec 196519.8ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
8 Dec 197024.8Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Aug 197428.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Oct 200155.6AppointedBishop of Mende, France
6 Jan 200255.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France
11 Jul 200660.4AppointedArchbishop of Toulouse (-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux), France
10 Sep 200660.5InstalledArchbishop of Toulouse (-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux), France

MicroData Summary for Robert Jean Louis Le Gall:
Archbishop Robert Jean Louis Le Gall O.S.B. (born ) Archbishop of Toulouse (-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 13 Sep 2014