Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hervé Gaschignard

Bishop of Aire et Dax


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1959 BornSaint-Nazaire
1 Jul 198930.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nantes, France
30 Oct 200748.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toulouse (-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux), France
30 Oct 200748.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bisuldino
6 Jan 200848.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bisuldino
24 Jan 201252.6AppointedBishop of Aire et Dax, France
11 Mar 201252.7InstalledBishop of Aire et Dax, France

MicroData Summary for Hervé Gaschignard:
Bishop Hervé Gaschignard (born ) Bishop of Aire et Dax

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aire et Dax.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,585
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013