Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Émile Joseph Bertrand

Bishop Emeritus of Mende


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1925 BornLa-Louptière-Thénard
10 Oct 194823.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 197549.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
12 Jun 197549.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tagaria
14 Sep 197550.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tagaria
14 Sep 198964.2AppointedBishop of Mende, France
16 Oct 200176.3RetiredBishop of Mende, France

MicroData Summary for Paul Émile Joseph Bertrand:
Bishop Paul Émile Joseph Bertrand (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mende

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mende.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 13 Jan 2014