Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Victor Bestion

Bishop of Tulle, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1957 Born
27 May 199033.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mende, France
12 Dec 201356.5AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
23 Feb 201456.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France

MicroData Summary for Francis Victor Bestion
Bishop Francis Victor Bestion (born ) Bishop of Tulle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFontans

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tulle.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2013
  • c1: CB, 12 Dec 2013
  • ob: CB, 20 Dec 2013
  • c2+: CB, 13 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018