Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pascal Jean Marcel Wintzer

Archbishop of Poitiers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1959 BornRouen
27 Jun 198727.5Ordained PriestPriest of Rouen, France
2 Apr 200747.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poitiers, France
2 Apr 200747.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusadus
19 May 200747.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusadus
12 Feb 201151.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Poitiers, France
13 Jan 201252.1AppointedArchbishop of Poitiers, France

MicroData Summary for Pascal Jean Marcel Wintzer:
Archbishop Pascal Jean Marcel Wintzer (born ) Archbishop of Poitiers

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Poitiers.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,421
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Jan 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 13 Jan 2014