Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Marie Louis Duval

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rouen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1928BornChenex
8 Jun 195223.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 197445.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
14 May 197445.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cannae
6 Jul 197445.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cannae
5 Jun 197849.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Rouen, France
6 May 198152.5SucceededArchbishop of Rouen, France
16 Oct 200375.0RetiredArchbishop of Rouen, France
23 May 200980.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph Marie Louis Duval
Archbishop Joseph Marie Louis Duval (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rouen

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 9 Mar 2016